Question NW3543 to the Minister of Transport
01 December 2017 - NW3543
Figlan, Mr AM to ask the Minister of Transport
(a) How many board members of the entities that report to him serve on boards of entities that report to other departments (b) what is the name of each board member (c) on which boards does each member serve (d) on what date was each member appointed in each case and (e) on what date will the term end in each case?
Reply:
Road Traffic Management Corporation (RTMC)
(a) Two (2) board members of the Road Traffic Management Corporation (RTMC) serve on boards of entities that report to other national departments
(b) the name of each board member is |
(c) each member serves on the following boards |
(d) each member was appointed on the following date in each case |
(e) the term ends on the following date in each case |
Ms Thembeka Mdlullwa |
Onderstepoort Biological Product |
1 August 2017 |
31 July 2020 |
Mr Thulani Kgomo |
Mpumalanga Community College |
07 July 2015 |
30 June 2020 |
RESPONSE: Road Accident Fund (RAF)
(a) Four board members of the Road Accident Fund (RAF) serve on boards of entities that report to other national departments
(b) the name of each board member is |
(c) each member serves on the following boards |
(d) each member was appointed on the following date in each case |
(e) the term ends on the following date in each case |
Mr. D Coovadia, |
Rand Water, |
1 April 2005, |
31 March 2018, |
KwaZulu–Natal Museum, |
1 September 2015, |
31 August 2018, |
|
Ms. LUZ Rataemane, |
National Council for Correctional Services, |
1 July 2016, |
30 June 2019, |
Ms. R Mokoena, |
International Frontier Technologies SOC Ltd, |
4 July 2017, |
linked to period of employment, |
Mr. K Mothobi, |
Trustee for Financial Services Consumer Education Foundation, |
18 May 2016, and |
no specified term. |
RESPONSE: South African Civil Aviation Authority (SACAA)
(a) Three (3) board members of the South African Civil Aviation Authority (SACAA) serve on boards of entities that report to other national departments
(a) How many board members serve on boards of entities that report to other departments? |
(b) What is the name of each board member? |
(c) On which boards does each member serve? |
(d) On what date was each member appointed in each case? |
(e) On what date will the term end in each case? |
Three Board Members |
|
Minerals and Petroleum Board |
10 October 2016 |
09 October 2019 |
|
National Lotteries Commission |
01 April 2017 |
2022 |
|
|
South African National Parks Safety at Sports and Recreation Events Board Appeal |
01 April 2015 15 April 2016 |
31 March 2018 30 April 2018 |
RESPONSE: Air Traffic & Navigation System (ATNS)
- Only one (1) ATNS Board Member serves on boards of entities that report to other departments. The details are in the table below:
(b) |
(c) |
(d) |
(e) |
Name of Board Member |
Board they serve |
Appointment Date |
End of Term Date |
Advocate Matane Edwin Mphahlele |
Agricultural Research Council (Member of the Council) Department of Agriculture |
01 April 2017 |
31 March 2020 |
RESPONSE: Cross-border Road Transport Agency (C-BRTA)
a) Only one (1) C-BRTA Board Member serves on boards of entities that report to other departments. The details are in the table below:
(b) |
(c) |
(d) |
(e) |
Name of Board Member |
Board they serve |
Appointment Date |
End of Term Date |
Ms Keitumetse Mahlangu |
Housing Rental Tribunal |
September 2016 |
August 2019 |
Sedibeng Liquor Committee |
January 2017 |
December 2020 |
|
Office of the Health Standards Office |
June 2017 |
May 2020 |
RESPONSE: PORTS REGULATOR
The Ports Regulator’s members of the board do not serve on the board(s) of other entities reporting to Departments.
a) N/A
b) N/A
(C) N/A
(d) N/A
RESPONSE: Passenger Rail Agency of South Africa (PRASA)
The PRASA Board members do not serve on the board(s) of other entities reporting to Departments.
a) N/A
b) N/A
(C) N/A
(d) N/A
RESPONSE: Railway Safety Regulator (RSR)
a) Only one (1) RSR Board Member serves on boards of entities that report to other departments. The details are in the table below:
(b) |
(c) |
(d) |
(e) |
Name of Board Member |
Board they serve |
Appointment Date |
End of Term Date |
Masaccha Khulekelwe Mbonambi |
Water Research Commission (WRC) |
01 Feb 2016 |
31 January 2019 |
Ithala Development Finance Corporation Limited (IDFC) |
01 June 2017 |
31 May 2018 |
RESPONSE: South African National Road Agency Limited (SANRAL)
The PRASA Board members do not serve on the board(s) of other entities reporting to Departments.
a) N/A
b) N/A
(C) N/A
(d) N/A
RESPONSE: Airport Company South Africa (ACSA)
The ACSA Board members do not serve on the board(s) of other entities reporting to Departments.
a) N/A
b) N/A
(C) N/A
(d) N/A
RESPONSE: Road Traffic Infringement Agency (RTIA)
- None
- None
- None
- None
- None
RESPONSE: South African Maritime Safety Authority (SAMSA)
- None
- None
- None
- None
- None