Question NW425 to the Minister of Tourism
15 May 2020 - NW425
De Freitas, Mr MS to ask the Minister of Tourism
(1)With reference to Board members of SA Tourism, (a) what other employment does each Board member have outside of SA Tourism, (b) how was each Board member vetted, (c) why was each Board member appointed in each case and (d) what remuneration does each Board member get in each month; (2) with reference to Board members of SA Tourism in the past three financial years, (a)(i) which Board members were appointed in each specified financial year and (ii) when was each specified Board member appointed and (b)(i) which Board members resigned in each financial year, (ii) when did each specified Board member resign and (iii) what reasons were cited for resignations in each case?
Reply:
1. Board Members of SAT
Board Member Name |
(a) What other employment does each Board Member have outside SA Tourism |
(b) How was each Board member vetted? |
(c ) Why was each Board Member appointed in each case |
(d) What Remuneration does each Board member get in each month? |
Mr Ravi Nadasen |
Chief Operations Officer: Tsogo Sun |
Board members are vetted through a verification of candidates’ identification, criminal record, ITC and qualification checks. The Board has undergone security screening. |
Human resource and hospitality sector experience. |
There is no monthly remuneration for members of the Board. Board members are remunerated at an hourly rate per meeting. The current hourly rate is R540.00 for Chairperson and R327 for members. There is no remuneration for Departmental representative |
Mr Thebeetsile Ikalafeng |
Managing Director: Brand Leadership |
Marketing and branding expertise. |
||
Mr Enver Duminy |
Chief Executive Officer: Cape Town Tourism |
Tourism marketing expertise. |
||
Ms Michelle Julie Constant |
Independent Consultant |
Arts and culture experience. |
||
Dr Abba Omar Jacoob |
Senior General Manager: Strategy & Communications |
International relations experience. |
||
Ms Kate Rivett-Carnac |
Independent Consultant |
Research and tourism experience. |
||
Ms Dawn Elizabeth Robertson |
CEO: Constitution Hill |
Arts, culture and tourism marketing. |
||
Ms Lindiwe Sangweni |
Chief Operations Officer: City Lodge Hotel Group |
Tourism industry and hospitality sector experience. |
||
Mr Siyabonga Dube, |
Independent Consultant: Chartered Accountant |
Governance, public sector Finance and Auditing experience. |
||
Ms Zola Tshefu |
Founder & Executive Director: LiLiBo Investments (Pty) Ltd |
Tourism and public sector governance experience. |
||
Ms Nomzamo Bhengu – Departmental representative |
Chief Director: Strategy & Systems: Department of Tourism |
Governance and administration. |
1(c) Board members are appointed on the basis of their knowledge, experience or qualifications relating to the functions of the Board.
2. SAT Board Members past three financial years
Financial Year |
(a)(i)Which Board Members were appointed in each financial year? |
a(ii) When was each specified Board Member appointed? |
2020/21 |
Ms. Gloria Serobe |
29 April 2020 |
Adv. Mojankunyane Gumbi |
29 April 2020 |
|
2019/20 |
Ms. Zola Baba Tshefu |
11 August 2019 |
Mr. Siyabonga Dube |
11 August 2019 |
|
2018/19 2017/18 |
Mr. David Frost |
01 March 2019 |
Mr. Monwabisi Fandeso |
01 June 2018 |
|
Ms. Pamela Bulelwa Yako |
01 June 2018 |
|
Dr. Tanya Ethel Abrahamse |
01 June 2018 |
|
Mr. Aloysius Thebeetsile Ikalafeng |
01 June 2012 01 June 2015 01 June 2018 |
|
Ms. Michelle Julie Constant |
01 June 2015 01 June 2018 |
|
Mr. Enver Duminy |
26 August 2016 01 June 2018 |
|
Mr. Yacoob Abba Omar |
21 November 2015 01 June 2018 |
|
Ms. Dawn Elizabeth Robertson |
01 June 2018 |
|
Ms. Kathleen Elizabeth Rivett-Carnac |
01 June 2018 |
|
Ms. Lindiwe Sangweni -Siddo |
01 June 2018 |
|
Mr. Ravi Nadasen |
01 June 2018 |
|
Mr. Mohamed Baba |
01 June 2018 |
|
Ms. Nomzamo Bhengu (Departmental representative) |
01 June 2018 |
Financial Year |
b (i)Which Board Members resigned in each financial year |
b.(ii) When did each specified Board Member resign? |
b.(iii) What reasons were cited for resignations in each case? |
2019/20 |
Ms. Pamela Yako |
04 September 2019 |
Stepped down as Board Chairperson, and subsequently stopped participation, as a result Board membership also lapsed |
Dr. Tanya Abrahamse |
03 September 2019 |
Other commitments |
|
Mr. Mohamed Baba |
25 June 2019 |
Other commitments |
|
Mr. David Frost |
29 July 2019 |
Other commitments |
|
2018/19 |
Mr. Monwabisi Fandeso |
14 August 2018 |
Other commitments. |
2017/18 |
None. |
None. |
None. |