Question NW2119 to the Minister of Cooperative Governance and Traditional Affairs
30 October 2017 - NW2119
Gardee, Mr GA to ask the Minister of Cooperative Governance and Traditional Affairs
How many municipalities across the country have municipal-owned entities; (2) Do the specified municipal-owned entities have boards in place; (if so (a) who appoints the board members, (b) how long is the term of each specified board, (c) when was each current board appointed and (d) how many members of each board are female?
Reply:
The information is not readily available in the department and requests were made to the Provincial Departments of Cooperative Governance and Traditional Affairs. However, only six provinces provided information in this regard:
PROVINCE |
How many municipalities across the country have municipal owned entities |
(2) |
|||
(a) Who appoints the board members |
(b) how long is the term of each specified board |
(c) When was each current board appointed |
(d) How many members of each board are female |
||
Western Cape |
City of Cape Town |
City of Cape Town and Western Cape Government |
It’s presumed to be a fixed term board |
Various dates – see list attached |
5 of 11 members are female |
Gauteng |
City of Tshwane |
The Board is appointed by the City of Tshwane as the shareholder |
The appointment of the Board is aligned to the five-year political term of Council |
1 October 2012 |
Tshwane Economic Development Agency – 3 female members |
10 April 2012 |
Housing Company Tshwane – 1 female member |
||||
City of Johannesburg |
City of Joburg |
1 year |
16 March 2017 |
City Power – 3 female members |
|
Joburg Water- 4 female members |
|||||
Pikitup – 4 female members |
|||||
Johannesburg Social Housing Company – 1 female member |
|||||
Joburg Development Agency – 2 female members |
|||||
Joburg Market – 2 female members |
|||||
Joburg Property Company – 3 female members |
|||||
Joburg Roads Agency – 5 female members |
|||||
Metrobus – 3 female members |
|||||
Joburg City Parks & Zoo – 3 female members |
|||||
Joburg City Theatres – 7 female members |
|||||
Metro Trading Company – 5 female members |
|||||
City of Ekurhuleni |
Council |
3 years |
1 May 2015 |
Brakpan Bus Company – 1 female member (resigned) |
|
Ekurhuleni Housing Company – 4 female members |
|||||
East Rand Water Care Company – 2 female members |
|||||
West Rand DM |
Executive Mayor |
3 years |
April 2017 |
West Rand Development Agency – 2 female members |
|
Sedibeng DM |
Council |
Not specified |
February 2015 |
Vaal River City Tourism Promotion Company – 1 female member |
|
North West |
Dr KKDM Economic Agency (SOC) Ltd. |
The Council of the Parent Municipality |
3 years |
1 January 2016 |
2 female members (1 resigned) |
Rustenburg LM |
Executive Mayor or the Council after an advertisement in the local newspapers |
2 years |
- |
1 female member |
|
Lekwa-Teemane Development Agency |
Council |
3 years |
In the process of appointing new board (recently terminated board was appointed Nov 2010 and term expired Oct 2013, however they remained an interim board until July 2017) |
- |
|
Mpumalanga |
The City of Mbombela inherited the Umjindi Local Economic Development Agency after the amalgamation of Mbombela LM and Umjindi LM |
City of Mbombela |
24 months |
New board in process of being appointed |
New board in process of being appointed |
Thabachweu Local Economic Development Agency (THALEDA) |
Council |
3 yrs |
20th October 2014 (An extension for a further one year was granted after the term of office expired in September 2017) |
1 female member |
|
Free State |
No response from the province |
||||
Northern Cape |
No municipality in the Northern Cape has a municipal-owned entity |
N/A |
N/A |
N/A |
N/A |
KwaZulu-Natal |
Umhlosinga Development Agency |
The respective District Municipality |
5 years |
26 March 2013 |
0 |
Zululand Development Agency |
3 years |
01 April 2016 |
3 female members |
||
Uthungulu Fresh Produce Market (King Cetshwayo) |
5 years |
2015 |
3 female members |
||
ILembe Management Development Enterprise |
3 years |
02 October 2015 |
3 female members |
||
UGu South Coast Development Agency |
3 years |
10 July 2015 |
3 female members |
||
Harry Gwala Development Agency |
3 years |
01 April 2015 |
0 |
||
UMgungundlovu Development Agency |
3 years |
01 July 2016 |
3 female members |
||
Umzinyathi Development Agency |
3 years |
16 October 2016 |
2 female members |
||
UThukela Development Agency |
3 years |
14 July 2017 |
1 female member |
||
Amajuba Development Agency (The Municipal Council is yet to Endorse the Board and conduct the inauguration) |
Nil - Awaiting Council Endorsement |
2015 |
0 |
||
Durban ICC |
5 years |
2014 |
1 female member |
||
Durban Marine Theme Park trading as Ushaka Marine world |
5 years |
2013 |
2 female members |
||
Safe City Pietermaritzburg |
5 years |
2015 |
2 female members |
||
Ugu South Coast Tourism |
5 years |
2015 |
3 female members |
||
Uthukela Water |
5 years |
2014 |
unknown |
||
Limpopo |
No response from the province |
||||
Eastern Cape |
No response from the province |