Question NW1107 to the Minister of Trade and Industry
22 June 2020 - NW1107
Cuthbert, Mr MJ to ask the Minister of Trade and Industry
(1)Whether, with reference to his reply to question 259 on 25 May 2020, he will furnish Mr M.J Cuthbert with the (a) names and (b) job titles of each employee of his department who has been on sabbatical leave since 1 January 2019; if not, in each case, why not; if so, what are the relevant details in each case; (2) whether any of the specified employees have subsequently applied for an additional period of sabbatical leave; if so, what are the relevant details of the additional period of leave (a) requested and (b) granted in each case? [NW1403E]
Reply:
I have requested the additional information and am advised as follows:
1. The names and the job titles of the relevant employees as per question 259 on 25 May 2020 who have taken sabbatical leave since 1 January 2019 and the details are as follows:
No |
(a) Name of employee |
(b) Job title |
Details |
||
Period |
Duration |
Details |
|||
1. |
Ms Z Kobue |
Deputy Director: Technology Architecture |
1 March 2019 to 30 November 2019 |
9 months |
Research and writing a dissertation towards an MBA |
2. |
Ms J.K.M Maifadi |
Assistant Director: MCEP |
1 April 2019 to 30 November 2019 |
8 months |
Research and writing a dissertation towards an MBA |
3. |
Mr M.M Mahlangu |
Administrative Assistant |
1 October 2019 to 31 August 2020 |
10 months |
Research and writing a dissertation towards a Masters in Business Management |
4. |
Ms A.T Mashimbyi |
Assistant Director: SACU |
1 May 2019 to 30 November 2019 |
7 months |
Research and writing a dissertation towards an MBA |
5. |
Mr N.S.C Nkuna |
Director: Communication and Marketing |
26 July 2019 to 25 January 2020 |
6 months |
Research and writing a dissertation towards an MBA |
6. |
Ms R Raluthaga |
Trade and Industry Advisor |
1 August 2019 to 31 October 2019 |
3 months |
Research and writing a dissertation towards a Masters in Public Management |
7. |
Ms R Ramdhani |
Deputy Director: Chemicals and Allied Industries |
16 August 2019 to 15 November 2019 |
3 months |
Research and writing a dissertation towards a Postgraduate Diploma in Monitoring and Evaluation |
8 |
Ms B.P Phatlane |
Trade and Industry Advisor |
16 January 2019 to 31 March 2019 |
2½ months |
Research and writing a dissertation towards a Masters in Public Administration |
9. |
Mr D.M Ndhlela |
Deputy Director: Regional Industrial Development |
1 April 2020 to 31 March 2021 |
12 months |
Research and writing a dissertation towards a PhD |
10. |
Ms A.T.V Lebuso |
Director: Organisational Development and Transformation |
1 February 2018 to 31 January 2019 |
12 months |
Research and writing a dissertation towards a Masters in Industrial/ Organisational Psychology |
11. |
Ms A.A Ontong |
Director: Human Resource Development |
3 April 2018 to 3 April 2019 |
12 months |
Research and writing a dissertation towards a PhD |
12. |
Mr S.J Melodi |
Investigator |
1 September 2019 to 31 December 2019 |
4 months |
Research and writing a dissertation towards a Masters in Law |
13. |
Mr A.N Makhuvela |
Deputy Director: Capital Equipment and Allied Industries |
1 October 2019 to 28 February 2020 |
5 months |
Research and writing a dissertation towards a Masters in Management (Public Policy) |
14. |
Ms J Scholtz |
Chief Operating Officer |
9 February 2018 to 8 February 2019 |
12 months |
Attendance of classes towards an MBA |
15. |
Ms J.R Vass |
Chief Director: Skills for the Economy |
1 April 2018 to 31 March 2019 |
12 months |
Research and writing a dissertation towards a PhD |
16. |
Ms P.Q Myeki |
Deputy Director: Industrial Climate Change Response |
1 April 2019 to 31 March 2020 |
12 months |
Research and writing a dissertation towards a Doctorate in Business Administration |
(2) None of the employees have subsequently applied for an additional period of sabbatical leave.
-END-